MD HB1304 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the business owner of a privately owned bus station or truck stop located in the State to post in restrooms in a specified manner a specified sign that provides National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information; requiring an agency that determines a violation has occurred to provide a notice to the business owner of a bus station or truck stop or the business owner's agent; etc.
Title
National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] |
Del. Peter Murphy [D] | Del. Leroy Myers [R] | Del. David Rudolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2011-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Aliens and Citizenship
Buses
Crimes and Punishments
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Human Rights
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Signs and Billboards
Telephones
Toilets
Trucks
Victims
Buses
Crimes and Punishments
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Human Rights
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Signs and Billboards
Telephones
Toilets
Trucks
Victims