MD HB1302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain individuals to file a petition for an extreme risk protective order with a certain court or a District Commissioner under certain circumstances; requiring a petition for an extreme risk protective order to contain certain information on the present danger including the number, types, and location of any known firearms in possession of the respondent; authorizing a judge to enter an interim extreme risk protective order to require the respondent to surrender any firearm in the respondent's possession; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50) (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-46) (Y: 94 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-17) (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88) (Y: 47 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85) (Y: 50 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (93-46)
2018-04-09HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50)
2018-04-09HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-07HouseDelegates Dumais, Morhaim, and Corderman
2018-04-07HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-07HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-07HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)
2018-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {403520/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {258778/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
2018-03-21SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (116-17)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {903725/3 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88)
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {822614/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1302&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1302f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1302t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1302e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_82261401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_79382401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_29392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_90372503.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_25877801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1302_40352001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1302.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1302_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0390.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0391.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0458.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1302_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1208.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1484.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1485.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback