MD HB130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration and the Baltimore City Department of Transportation to study and analyze dedicated bus lane enforcement mechanisms in use by peer transit agencies and develop a certain enforcement plan; requiring the study to include an overview of best practices and technologies, a review of potential costs, and an evaluation of the most effective methods for ensuring compliance with and enforcement of existing law; requiring a report on the findings of the study be submitted by December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {170911/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Special Order until end of this calendar (Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {170911/1 |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Mass Transit
Reports
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Mass Transit
Reports
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of