MD HB130 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination of a distribution of certain local impact grant funds from video lottery terminal proceeds to communities within 3 miles of the Laurel Race Course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-1) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 767
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (42-1)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-01-31HouseHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-15HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback