MD HB13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an application for a license, an identification card, or a moped operator's permit to allow an applicant to indicate the applicant's sex as female, male or unspecified; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the license, identification card, or moped operator's permit of an applicant who indicates that the applicant's sex is unspecified displays a certain notation; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-08-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Gender
Identification
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Notices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Gender
Identification
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Notices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration