MD HB13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City to post signs reasonably calculated to notify the public of the presence of an area designated as a "High Crime Zone", A "Stop and Frisk Zone", or any similar name; and requiring signs to be placed intermittently around the perimeter of the designated areas to notify the public of the existence and effects of the designation.
Title
Baltimore City - High Crime Zones - Required Public Notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2017-01-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-10-13 | House | Pre-filed |