MD HB13 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that realized capital gains are not income of a perpetual care trust fund and shall be deposited in the trust fund as principal; providing that a specified restriction on the use of perpetual care trust funds to make loans or investments in the real property of a cemetery applies to the buildings and structures appurtenant to the property; clarifying that realized capital gains are income of a preneed trust account; etc.
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-14 | House | Special Order until 2/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876880/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-11-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Investments
Loans
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Cemeteries
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Investments
Loans
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes