MD HB13 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from distributing Salvia divinorum or Salvinorin A to an individual under the age of 21 years; prohibiting a person under the age of 21 years from possessing Salvia divinorum or Salvinorin A; establishing that a specified violation is a Code violation; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Salvia Divinorum and Salvinorin A - Distribution to and
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2009-08-07 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorney General
Citations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Drugs
Fines
Forms
Identification
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
State`s Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Summonses
Trials
Youth
Attorney General
Citations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Drugs
Fines
Forms
Identification
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
State`s Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Summonses
Trials
Youth
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0013.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0013f.pdf |