MD HB1297 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a lender to elect to make a certain loan to a borrower under certain circumstances; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain loans under certain circumstances; prohibiting an unlicensed person from making a covered loan; providing that certain loans are void and unenforceable under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain persons from collecting or attempting to collect in a certain manner certain money or enforcing or attempting to enforce a certain contract in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387372/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {283693/1 Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {853598/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Fees
Financial Institutions
Interest
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notices
Prices
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Fees
Financial Institutions
Interest
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notices
Prices