MD HB1295 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "Tier 1 county" as a county exceeding certain unemployment rates and with less than or equal to 75% of the median State income during certain periods; repealing a certain start-up tax credit under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit Program; expanding the eligibility requirements for a certain project tax credit by altering, under certain circumstances, the number of qualified positions that a qualified business entity is required to create; etc.
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsors
Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] |
Sen. Paul Corderman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {469034/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {785669/1 Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {915769/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Income Tax
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Income Tax
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment