MD HB129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a certain annual appropriation in the State Budget for the Mayor and Aldermen of the City of Annapolis to pay for services provided to the State by the City of Annapolis be at least $750,000; and requiring that each fiscal year starting in fiscal year 2022, the annual appropriation be increased by the increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Baltimore Metropolitan Statistical Area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 4
2019-03-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-04SenateThird Reading Passed (42-5)
2019-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-27SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-11)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback