MD HB129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person in Caroline County to hunt deer on specified Sundays on private property using specified hunting equipment during specified months.
Title
Caroline County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (124-9) | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-23 | First Reading Environmental Matters |