MD HB1284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Human Resources or a local department of social services to provide to a health care practitioner specified information if requested by the health care practitioner or a specified agency, institution, or program under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to work with relevant stakeholders and report the outcome of the work to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-7) (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-7) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802712/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Disclosure
Family Law
Health
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Disclosure
Family Law
Health
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services