MD HB1283 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a specified provision of law authorizing a holder of a Class 5 brewery license to serve specified samples of beer at no charge to individuals who have attained the legal drinking age and are on a tour of the brewery or are attending a specified event at the brewery; authorizing a license holder to brew and bottle beer at a location other than the Class 5 brewery under specified circumstances; authorizing a specified type of Class 5 brewery to sell beer for on-premises consumption under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-15) (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33) (Y: 5 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
2017-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (119-15)
2017-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
2017-04-07SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1)
2017-04-07SenateMotion Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33)
2017-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {564132/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {793522/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
2017-03-16HouseSpecial Order until 03/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2017-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {343391/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2017-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1283&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1283f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1283t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1283e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_813_hb1283e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1283_34339101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1283_79352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1283_56413201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1283.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1283_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1283_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1283,h-0648&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1283,s-1248&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1283,s-1249&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1283,s-1250&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1283,h-1386&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback