MD HB1281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to make available to the public any reports, studies, or other documents produced by the Administration or by any consultant or contractor for the Administration during the initial project planning phase or final project planning phase; authorizing the Administration to redact traffic accident data from any report, study, or other document but prohibiting the Administration from withholding the report, study, or other document in its entirety; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public Access
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Construction
Contractors
Data
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning
Construction
Contractors
Data
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning