MD HB128 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified members of the Judges' Retirement System may receive additional service credit for military service if the member has a specified amount of service credit earned through employment by a specified date, is unable to accumulate 10 years of service credit due to mandatory retirement at age 70, becomes a retiree due to mandatory retirement, and has a specified amount of service credit at the time of retirement; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Exception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Claims
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Veterans
Claims
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Veterans