MD HB128 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting to a person charged by indictment or criminal information with a crime triable in circuit court and convicted of that crime the authority to file a petition for writ of actual innocence under specified circumstances; requiring a specified person who files a petition for writ of actual innocence to notify the State of the filing in a specified manner; authorizing the State to file a response to a petition for writ of actual innocence within a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Notice of Filing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Senators Gladden, Haines, and Raskin | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Delegates Anderson, Barnes, and Carter | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Bail
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Hearings
Notices
Petitions
Prisoners
Victims
Bail
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Hearings
Notices
Petitions
Prisoners
Victims