MD HB1277 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Invalidating a power of sale or assent to decree authorized in a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property that is executed on or after October 1, 2019; requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property to be commenced only by the owner of the debt instrument of a mortgage or deed of trust; requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on certain residential property to be commenced by filing a complaint; etc.
Title
Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |