MD HB1276 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing tax credits against the State, county, and municipal corporation property taxes and the State income tax for specified conservation property donated to NeighborSpace of Baltimore County, Inc.; etc.
Title
Income and Property Tax Credits - Conservation Easements - NeighborSpace of
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Conservation
Easements
Gifts
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Conservation
Easements
Gifts
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1276.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1276f.pdf |