MD HB1273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with the appropriate stakeholders, to develop guidelines to assist public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to draft policies that limit civil immigration enforcement activities on their premises for certain purposes; authorizing public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to establish and publish policies that limit immigration enforcement on their premises to the fullest extent possible consistent with federal and State law and based on the Attorney General's guidelines; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration Enforcement – Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses – Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-36) (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (93-36)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {722811/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback