MD HB1273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist to substitute an interchangeable biological product for a prescribed product under specified circumstances; requiring a pharmacist or the pharmacist's designee, except under specified circumstances, to inform specified consumers of the availability of an interchangeable biological product and the approximate cost difference as compared to a specified drug; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy to maintain on its Web site a link to specified lists of biological products; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Identification
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Public Information
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Identification
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Public Information