MD HB1273 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program in Anne Arundel County; requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education, in collaboration with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, to provide awareness for all school-based personnel on human trafficking; requiring the Department and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide materials to the Board describing specified resources available for school-based personnel; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {235469/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Rights
Prostitution
Public Information
Reports
Teachers
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Rights
Prostitution
Public Information
Reports
Teachers