MD HB1268 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision of law that prohibits an individual in detention for or previously convicted of a felony that is not a crime of violence from being eligible for a specified pretrial release program in Calvert County; and providing that an individual in detention for or previously convicted of a specified crime is not eligible for a specified program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506
2016-04-11HouseReturned Passed
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {152419/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1268&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1268f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1268t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_506_hb1268t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1268_15241901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1268.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1268_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1268_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1268,h-0500&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1268,s-1218&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback