MD HB1268 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing specified individuals who are licensed to practice specified health occupations in the State to dispense prescription drugs to patients under specified circumstances; requiring applicants to comply with specified standards; establishing specified standards for the operation of specified offices; establishing specified requirements to apply for a dispensing permit; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy to issue a dispensing permit under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drugs - Dispensing Permits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
2011-03-09 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-07 Re-referred Health and Government Operations
2011-02-23 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback