MD HB126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB82

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Third Reading Passed (126-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a pretrial services program that receives a certain grant from charging a fee to a defendant for participation in the program; and extending the termination date of the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to June 30, 2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (126-2)
2021-02-23HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2021-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-16HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2021-01-15HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-06-16HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB229 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
HB82 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety41104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback