MD HB126 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB105
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to notify an employee before the employer files a certain petition; providing immunity from civil liability to a certain employer under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {468878/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {468878/1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {532113/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB126 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB846 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB846 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
District Courts
Hearings
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Courts
District Courts
Hearings
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |