MD HB126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from requiring, as a condition of employment or continued employment, an employee or a prospective employee, under certain circumstances, to join or remain a member of a labor organization, pay charges to a labor organization, or pay a certain amount to a third party; prohibiting an employer from threatening an employee or a prospective employee with certain action; providing certain penalties for violation of the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsors
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Fees
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Fees
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment