MD HB126 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the authorized uses of the State Wildlife Management and Protection Fund; repealing specified requirements that the Department of Natural Resources use specified funds from specified hunting license sales for specified purposes; requiring a person who harvests a game bird or mammal to report the harvest in accordance with specified regulations; requiring a person who possesses a game bird or mammal killed by means other than hunting to report the possession in accordance with specified regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-17SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2017-02-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-13HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback