MD HB126 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the definition of "consumer" under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act to include a specified organization that purchases, rents, or leases goods or services for the benefit of the members of the organization; expanding the definition of "consumer goods" and "consumer services" under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act to include specified goods and services purchased, rented, or leased by a specified organization for the benefit of members of the organization; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Scope

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-3) (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-25) (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350
2013-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2013-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (126-3)
2013-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2013-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2013-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-02SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {833428/1 Adopted
2013-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {857275/1 Report Adopted
2013-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2013-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2013-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (111-25)
2013-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2013-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-17HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0126&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0126f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0126t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0126e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_350_hb0126e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0126_83342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0126_85727501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0126.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0126_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0126_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0126,h-0395&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0126,s-0957&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0126,h-1125&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback