MD HB1259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore Police Department to submit, beginning in fiscal year 2019 and in each subsequent fiscal year, a report on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly; and requiring the Department to submit a half-year report for fiscal year 2018 on the expenditure of grants received from the Governor's Office of Crime Control.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {924869/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Grants
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes