MD HB1258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland State Bank Task Force to review and evaluate the creation of a Maryland State Bank; providing for the membership and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting members of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring a final report by December 1, 2012; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1258.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1258f.pdf |