MD HB1256 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring State and local correctional facilities, beginning in 2019, to provide the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention by March 1 each year with certain information on correctional officer-involved deaths of inmates and deaths in the line of duty; requiring, on or before October 15, 2018, the Office to report to the General Assembly on the number of correctional officer-involved deaths of inmates and deaths in the line of duty that occurred during the previous 3 calendar years; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Data
Death
Public Safety
Reports
Correctional Officers
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Data
Death
Public Safety
Reports