MD HB1254 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring it is the policy of the State to reduce the use of dental amalgam; requiring a specified manufacturer or wholesaler of dental amalgam to submit a specified plan to the Department of the Environment on or before September 30, 2014; prohibiting a manufacturer or wholesaler of dental amalgam from selling or offering for sale dental amalgam in the State on or after October 1, 2014, unless specified conditions are met; etc.
Title
Environment - Dental Amalgam - Reduction in Use
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Dentists
Electronic Commerce
Environment
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Occupations
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Dentists
Electronic Commerce
Environment
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health Occupations
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology