MD HB1249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to be administered by the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and to provide a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; providing that payments made to certain health care providers from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board may not exceed a total of $750,000 annually; etc.
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416489/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Subjects
AIDS
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Diseases
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Liability
Notices
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims