MD HB1249 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Delegates Stein, Folden, and Gilchrist
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Delegates Stein, Folden, and Gilchrist
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to issue a complimentary angler's license, Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license, or hunting license and any associated State-issued stamps or permits to a person who is a recipient of the Purple Heart award.
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Complimentary Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Delegates Stein, Folden, and Gilchrist |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2016-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {364338/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {730412/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Disabilities
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Veterans
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Disabilities
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Veterans