MD HB1247 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing provisions of law that establish the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County; requiring the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County to be as set by the County Executive and County Council of Anne Arundel County; and providing for the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {406783/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback