MD HB1243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration's annual report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State include certain information relating to outpatient and substance-related disorders program services used by children and young adults and behavioral health services provided through telehealth; altering the scope of certain data required to be included in the report; requiring that certain data in the report be grouped by race and ethnicity; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB520 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Children
Data
Demographics
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Ethnic Affairs
Foster Care
Group Homes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Children
Data
Demographics
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Ethnic Affairs
Foster Care
Group Homes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 505.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |