MD HB1242 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Department of Education to include operating funds for the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped in its budget; requiring the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to receive a specified amount of funding beginning in fiscal year 2016 and in each fiscal year thereafter; requiring the Department to disburse funds to the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped; etc.
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {985163/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |