MD HB124 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health insurance carrier to disclose the aggregate incurred claims of the group to a large employer if the carrier is experience rating the large employer's health benefit plan; requiring the disclosure of the aggregate incurred claims to be made within 30 days after receipt of a request from the large employer and in a specified format; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {576588/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Disclosure
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Privacy
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Claims
Disclosure
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Privacy
Time
Work, Labor and Employment