MD HB124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified residential customers are entitled to only a specified number of directory assistance calls each month without charge; requiring the Public Service Commission to approve other charges for directory assistance, subject to an exception; and repealing a provision that authorizes the Commission to establish additional exemptions from directory assistance charges.
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Charges for Directory Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-2) (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-2) (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |