MD HB1239 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to make financial assistance available certain developers working in low-income census tracts in order to help close appraisal gaps that occur in historically redlined neighborhoods; requiring that the amount of financial assistance is not to exceed 35% of the lesser of the total cost of eligible construction expenses, or 80% of the national median sale price for new homes on the date of sale; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (109-25)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {920616/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-10HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB859 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development42801(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42802(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42803(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42804(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42805(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42806(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback