MD HB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 3.0 to 2.5 the cumulative grade point average that a certain individual must maintain or have maintained during a certain academic year to qualify for participation in the Maryland Technology Internship Program.
Title
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {604962/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Education
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Economic and Community Development
Education
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology