MD HB1227 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "extraordinary economic development opportunity" for purposes of the Economic Development Opportunities Program Account to include attraction of a new wind turbine manufacturing facility to the State, or the expansion, to include wind turbine manufacturing, of an existing private sector enterprise, that meets specified requirements; providing that specified State incentives may not exceed $50,000,000; etc.
Title
Economic Development Opportunities Program Account - Wind Turbine Manufacturing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-02-18 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1227.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1227f.pdf |