MD HB1221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue certain licenses in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; and prohibiting certain license holders in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district from selling alcoholic beverages at certain times of day.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – 40th Alcoholic Beverages District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983921/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB757 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1002.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |