MD HB1221 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain prohibition against hunting on a Sunday and authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on a Sunday on private property or on public land designated by the Department; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer in a county for a half day on certain Sundays; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer in a county for a full day on certain Sundays in certain deer seasons; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations by October 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Hunting - Sundays

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback