MD HB1221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a telephone company that provides specified service from replacing specified copper landline service with optical fiber cable or Voice over Internet Protocol, subject to an exception; and requiring the Public Service Commission to report its findings and recommendations on specified matters to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021.
Title
Public Utilities - Residential Copper Landline Replacement - Moratorium and Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Public Service Commission
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Public Service Commission
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation