MD HB122 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 1 @ 1:00 pm House Judiciary Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the scope of a certain provision of law requiring the expungement of certain police and court records relating to the charging of a certain crime or civil offense if no charge in the case resulted in a certain disposition and altering the charges to which it applies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-07HouseHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2021-10-29HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB138 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure10105.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure10105.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback