MD HB1219 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the qualifications for early childhood education teacher certification completed through an alternative teacher preparation program; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to establish specific goals for the recruitment and retention of teachers in teacher preparation programs; requiring that "high staff qualifications" for publicly funded eligible prekindergarten providers must be implemented by the 2027-2028 school year; etc.
Title
Maryland Educator Shortage Reduction Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-6) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-1) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623029/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-6) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713420/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB893 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Subjects
Appeals
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Data
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
General Assembly
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mentors
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Tuition
Weights and Measures
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Data
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
General Assembly
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mentors
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Tuition
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |