MD HB1213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland 529 Board to establish a Maryland Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan on or before July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Maryland 529 - Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan - Required Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Prices
Records
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Prices
Records