MD HB121 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revising, restating, and recodifying certain terms; updating the plans, regulations, and ordinances of St. Mary's County in accordance with which a connection to a completed water main or sewer of the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission shall be made under certain circumstances; clarifying that the Metropolitan Commission shall have full and complete jurisdiction over certain appurtenances with certain systems; clarifying that the Metropolitan Commission may commence a third-party action under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 66
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {640714/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
St. Mary's County1131(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11310(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11311(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11312A(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11312B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11312C(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11312D(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11313(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11314(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11315(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11316A(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11316B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11316C(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11316D(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11317(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11318(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11319(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131A(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131C(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131D(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131E(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1131F(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1132(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11320(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11321(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11322(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11323(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11324(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11325(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11326(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11327(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11328(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11329L(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1133(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11330(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1134(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1135(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1136(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1137(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1138(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1139(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback